NC S730 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-31 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-31 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Taxpayer Action if No DOR Determination
Title
Taxpayer Action if No DOR Determination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-25 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2011 | |
2011-05-25 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-23 | Placed On Cal For 5/25/2011 | |
2011-05-23 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-19 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |