NC S721 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Judiciary III
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Judiciary III
Summary
Allow Electronic Suprvsn./MH/DD Facilities.
Title
Allow Electronic Suprvsn./MH/DD Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Goss [D] | Sen. David Hoyle [D] | Rep. Joe Queen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Ref to the Com on Mental Health Reform, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Mental Health & Youth Services | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S721 |