NC S711 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

NC Compassionate Care Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Compassionate Care Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-08HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2022-06-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2022-06-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2022-06-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2022-06-06SenateEngrossed
2022-06-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2022-06-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2022-06-02SenateAmend Tabled A2
2022-06-02SenateAmend Adopted A1
2022-06-01SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-08-25SenateRe-ref Com On Health Care
2021-08-25SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-25SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-08-04SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-07-21SenateRe-ref Com On Health Care
2021-07-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-07-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-07-01SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-07-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-07-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-17SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-08SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-08SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-07SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105164.13(n/a)Citation Text
106121(n/a)Citation Text
15A974(n/a)Citation Text
90113.110(n/a)Citation Text
90113.111(n/a)Citation Text
90113.112(n/a)Citation Text
90113.113(n/a)Citation Text
90113.114(n/a)Citation Text
90113.115(n/a)Citation Text
90113.116(n/a)Citation Text
90113.117(n/a)Citation Text
90113.118(n/a)Citation Text
90113.119(n/a)Citation Text
90113.120(n/a)Citation Text
90113.121(n/a)Citation Text
90113.122(n/a)Citation Text
90113.123(n/a)Citation Text
90113.124(n/a)Citation Text
90113.125(n/a)Citation Text
90113.126(n/a)Citation Text
90113.127(n/a)Citation Text
90113.128(n/a)Citation Text
90113.129(n/a)Citation Text
90113.130(n/a)Citation Text
90113.131(n/a)Citation Text
90113.132(n/a)Citation Text
90113.133(n/a)Citation Text
90113.134(n/a)Citation Text
90113.136(n/a)Citation Text
90113.137(n/a)Citation Text
90113.138(n/a)Citation Text
90113.139(n/a)Citation Text
90113.140(n/a)Citation Text
90113.141(n/a)Citation Text
90113.142(n/a)Citation Text
9087(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S711
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S711v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S711v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S711v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S711v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S711v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S711v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S711v6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52434/0/S711-PCS15315-BPf-15
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52521/0/S711-PCS35316-RBxf-13
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52866/0/S711-PCS35328-BPx-20
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52916/0/S711-PCS45459-BPx-21
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54627/0/S711-ABP-35-V-14
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54628/0/S711-ABP-40-V-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S711-SMBP-63(CSBPxfr-15)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S711-SMBP-64(e2)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S711-SMBP-67(CSBPx-20)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S711-SMBP-71(e4)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S711-SMBP-106(e5)-v-6
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/568
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/567
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/566
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/569

Bill Comments

feedback