NC S701 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Ref To Com On State Personnel
Pending: House State Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Ref To Com On State Personnel
Pending: House State Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
TSERS/LGERS Return of Contributions
Title
TSERS/LGERS Return of Contributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On State Personnel | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |