NC S688 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Failed 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sports Wagering
Title
Sports Wagering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - A1 Morey Second Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - House - A2 Morey Second Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 51 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 52 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - House - Second Reading M6 Reconsider (Y: 44 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-08-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - A2 Morey Second Reading M3 To Lay On The Table (Y: 51 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 52 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - House - Second Reading M6 Reconsider (Y: 44 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-08-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Failed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-22 | House | Amend Tabled A2 |
2022-06-22 | House | Amend Tabled A1 |
2022-06-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-11-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 1 |
2021-11-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Judiciary 1, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-09-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-08-24 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-08-23 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-08-19 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H631 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Animals
Auditing & Audits
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Commissions
Criminal Records
Fines & Penalties
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Horses & Mules
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Minorities
Public
Racing
Records
Reporting
Revenue Dept.
Sports
Studies
Taxation
Tribes & Tribal Government
Auditing & Audits
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Commissions
Criminal Records
Fines & Penalties
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Horses & Mules
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Minorities
Public
Racing
Records
Reporting
Revenue Dept.
Sports
Studies
Taxation
Tribes & Tribal Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143B | 437.110 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.111 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.112 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.113 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.114 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 947 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 114 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 120 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 901 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 902 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 903 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 904 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 905 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 906 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 907 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 908 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 909 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 910 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 911 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 912 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 913 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 914 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 915 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 916 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 917 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 918 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 919 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 920 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 921 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 922 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 923 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 924 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 925 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 926 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 927 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18C | 928 | (n/a) | Citation Text |