NC S677 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Protect Right to Hunt and Fish

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Right to Hunt and Fish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - A3 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-06-25 - House - A4 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-06-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 90 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25 Ch. SL 2018-96
2018-06-25 Ratified
2018-06-25SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-25SenateConcurred In H Amend S677v3
2018-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-25SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Amend
2018-06-25HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-25HouseAmend Failed A4
2018-06-25HouseAmend Failed A3
2018-06-25HouseAmendment Withdrawn A2
2018-06-25HouseAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-21HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2018
2018-06-21HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-21HouseReptd Fav
2018-06-21HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2018-06-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-06-21HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2018-06-21SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-20SenateEngrossed
2018-06-20SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-20SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-20SenateAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-20SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-19SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-06SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=S677&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S677v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S677v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S677v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S677v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S677v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/Senate/HTML/S677v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=742
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=741
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=740
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=762
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1255
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1254
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1253
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1252
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1251

Bill Comments

feedback