NC S657 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Hexavalent Chromium in Groundwater
Title
Study Hexavalent Chromium in Groundwater
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H567 (Same As) 2017-04-06 - Ref To Com On Environment