NC S655 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-19 - Ch. SL 2012-195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-19 - Ch. SL 2012-195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dentistry Management Arrangements
Title
Dentistry Management Arrangements
Sponsors
Sen. Austin Allran [R] | Sen. Thomas Apodaca [R] | Sen. Douglas Berger [D] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Edward Jones [D] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] | Sen. William Purcell [D] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A1 Samuelson\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A1 Samuelson\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-19 | Ch. SL 2012-195 | |
2012-07-19 | Signed By Gov. 7/19/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-06-15 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-07 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H698 (Same As) 2011-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House