NC S647 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mutual Insurance Holding Companies
Title
Mutual Insurance Holding Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 8\To Adopt (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - C Rpt Adopt (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-161 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-27 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-27 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Conf Com Reported | |
2012-06-26 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-26 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2012-06-26 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2012-06-25 | Placed On Cal For 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-25 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Insurance | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-19 | Ref to Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-18 | Filed |