NC S639 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Ch. SL 2013-197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bd. of Agriculture Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bd. of Agriculture Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-26 Ch. SL 2013-197
2013-06-26 Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013
2013-06-19 Pres. To Gov. 06/19/2013
2013-06-19 Ratified
2013-06-18HouseOrdered Enrolled
2013-06-18HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-06-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-06-18HouseAdded to Calendar
2013-06-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-06-18HouseReptd Fav
2013-04-22HouseRef To Com On Agriculture
2013-04-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-18HouseRec From Senate
2013-04-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-04-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-04-16SenateReptd Fav
2013-04-03SenateRef To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2013-04-03SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-02SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback