NC S635 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Ch. SL 2013-232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transmission Line Ownership
Title
Transmission Line Ownership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - A1 Hager Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Ch. SL 2013-232 | |
2013-07-03 | Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013 | |
2013-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 06/28/2013 | |
2013-06-27 | Ratified | |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013 |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-06-19 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-06-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-06-17 | House | Postponed To 06/19/2013 |
2013-06-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013 |
2013-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-05-13 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-08 | House | Postponed To 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-07 | House | Postponed To 05/08/2013 |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-22 | House | Ref To Com On Public Utilities and Energy |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed |