NC S628 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Ref To Com On Environment
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Ref To Com On Environment
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
WQ Permitting/Withheld Information
Title
WQ Permitting/Withheld Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Environment | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-19 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Filed |