NC S61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Placed On Cal For 10/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Community Colleges Budget/2019-2021 Biennium

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Colleges Budget/2019-2021 Biennium

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/22/2019
2019-10-17SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-10-10HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-08HousePlaced On Cal For 10/09/2019
2019-10-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-08HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-09-27HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2019-09-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-13HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-05HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-05HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-07-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-29HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-23HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-25HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-07HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-03-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-05SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-05SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 03/05/2019
2019-02-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-21SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback