NC S599 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Failed To Override Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Open Skating Rinks/Bowling Alleys

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Skating Rinks/Bowling Alleys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-08 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 68 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08SenateFailed To Override Veto
2020-07-06SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2020
2020-07-02 Vetoed 07/02/2020
2020-06-22 Pres. To Gov. 6/22/2020
2020-06-19 Ratified
2020-06-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-18SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2020-06-17SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/18/2020
2020-06-17SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-06-17HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-17HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-17HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-16HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-15HousePlaced On Cal For 06/16/2020
2020-06-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-15HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-30SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S599
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S599v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S599v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S599v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S599v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S599v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S599v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/209
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/964
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/768
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/889

Bill Comments

feedback