NC S561 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Funds for Special Education Scholarships
Title
Funds for Special Education Scholarships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-09-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-09-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-09-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-09-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-08-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-08-19 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-08-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/19/2015 |
2015-08-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-08-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2015-08-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-08-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-08-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-07-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges |
2015-07-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |