NC S559 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Pensions and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Pensions and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Treasury Administrative Changes Act.-AB
Title
Treasury Administrative Changes Act.-AB
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H173 (Same As) 2023-07-10 - Ch. SL 2023-93
Subjects
Accounting
Council Of State
Financial Services
Funds & Accounts
Investments
Public
Public Officials
State Treasurer
Council Of State
Financial Services
Funds & Accounts
Investments
Public
Public Officials
State Treasurer
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
147 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
147 | 68.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 69.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 76 | (n/a) | Citation Text |