NC S534 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Ch. SL 2015-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Ch. SL 2015-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
2015 Continuing Budget Authority
Title
2015 Continuing Budget Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Ch. SL 2015-133 | |
2015-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2015 | |
2015-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 06/30/2015 | |
2015-06-30 | Ratified | |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-06-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Information Technology |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H632 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - Ch. SL 2016-11