NC S511 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proof Required for Debt/Fees
Title
Proof Required for Debt/Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Filed |