NC S5 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Ch. SL 2015-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Ch. SL 2015-10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Union County Local Act
Title
Union County Local Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Ch. SL 2015-10 | |
2015-04-27 | Ratified | |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-23 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed |