NC S488 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-556
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-556
Summary
Establish Proportionate Sentence Lengths.
Title
Establish Proportionate Sentence Lengths.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-556 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Postponed To 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-07-28 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-07-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-20 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-07-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-13 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-13 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-10 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S488 |