NC S474 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Photo ID for Certain Controlled Substances
Title
Photo ID for Certain Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-349 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-14 | Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary | |
2011-04-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-20 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-04-19 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-04-19 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-31 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H656 (Same As) 2011-11-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House