NC S452 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Utilities/User Responsible for Utility Bill
Title
Utilities/User Responsible for Utility Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Committees
Consumer & Family Advisory Comm.
Consumer Protection
Debtor & Creditor
Disabled Persons
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Health Services
Infrastructure
Mental Health
Public
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications
Telephones
Utilities
Consumer & Family Advisory Comm.
Consumer Protection
Debtor & Creditor
Disabled Persons
Electricity Generation & Distribution
Health Services
Infrastructure
Mental Health
Public
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications
Telephones
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
153A | 277 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 314 | (n/a) | Citation Text |