NC S443 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC Museum of Art/Cemetery Comm. Changes
Title
NC Museum of Art/Cemetery Comm. Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - A2 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - A1 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - A2 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - A1 Moore, T.\Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Ch. SL 2012-120 | |
2012-06-28 | Signed By Gov. 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Ratified | |
2012-06-20 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-20 | Placed On Cal For 6/20/2012 | |
2012-06-20 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-19 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-19 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-18 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-18 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2012 | |
2012-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-12 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On State Personnel | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-29 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2011-03-29 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-28 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H538 (Same As) 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-371