NC S433 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Ch. SL 2009-55
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Ch. SL 2009-55
Summary
First Craven Sanitary District Validation.
Title
First Craven Sanitary District Validation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Ch. SL 2009-55 | |
2009-06-04 | Ratified | |
2009-06-04 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Ref To Com On Local Government II | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-05 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H488 (Same As) 2011-04-20 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S433 |