NC S430 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Ch. SL 2013-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Ch. SL 2013-58
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Electric Load Control Process
Title
Clarify Electric Load Control Process
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Ch. SL 2013-58 | |
2013-05-30 | Signed by Gov. 5/30/2013 | |
2013-05-24 | Pres. To Gov. 05/24/2013 | |
2013-05-23 | Ratified | |
2013-05-22 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/22/2013 |
2013-05-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Environment |
2013-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-23 | House | Ref To Com On Public Utilities and Energy |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H489 (Same As) 2013-04-15 - Re-ref Com On Public Utilities and Energy