NC S421 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-02 - Ch. SL 2021-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-02 - Ch. SL 2021-133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
CC/In-State Tuition & Board Elections
Title
CC/In-State Tuition & Board Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-02 | Ch. SL 2021-133 | |
2021-09-02 | Signed by Gov. 9/2/2021 | |
2021-08-26 | Pres. To Gov. 8/26/2021 | |
2021-08-25 | Ratified | |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/24/2021 |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-08-19 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-12 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/04/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Authorities
Boards
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Board
Education
Education Assistance Authority
Elections
General Assembly
Higher Education
Membership
Presented
Public
Ratified
Residency
Secondary Education
Tuition
Authorities
Boards
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Board
Education
Education Assistance Authority
Elections
General Assembly
Higher Education
Membership
Presented
Public
Ratified
Residency
Secondary Education
Tuition
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115D | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115D | 2.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115D | 39 | (n/a) | Citation Text |