NC S41 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Ch. SL 2021-87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Ch. SL 2021-87
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Remove Certain Satellite Annexation Caps
Title
Remove Certain Satellite Annexation Caps
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-14 - Senate - Third Reading For Concurrence (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Second Reading For Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Second Reading For Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Ch. SL 2021-87 | |
2021-07-15 | Ratified | |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/13/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-07-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-24 | House | Ruled Material |
2021-06-24 | House | Serial Referral To Local Government Stricken |
2021-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-11 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H24 (Same As) 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-152
Subjects
Annexation
Chaptered
Cleveland County
Counties
Franklinville
Gaston County
Kings Mountain
Liberty
Local
Local Government
Lowell
Moore County
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Ramseur
Randolph County
Ratified
Shelby
Stanley
Vass
Chaptered
Cleveland County
Counties
Franklinville
Gaston County
Kings Mountain
Liberty
Local
Local Government
Lowell
Moore County
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Ramseur
Randolph County
Ratified
Shelby
Stanley
Vass
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160A | 58.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |