NC S408 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Rural Healthcare Access & Savings Plan Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Healthcare Access & Savings Plan Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2022-06-29SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2022-06-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2022-06-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2022-06-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2022-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2022-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2022-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2022-06-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2022-06-28HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2022-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2022-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2022-06-28HouseRuled Material
2022-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2022-06-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2022-06-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2022-06-22HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2022-06-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-11HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-11SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-06SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/10/2021
2021-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-21SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-31SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-31SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-30SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
108D1(n/a)Citation Text
12019(n/a)Citation Text
12019.1(n/a)Citation Text
12019.4(n/a)Citation Text
1203.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S408
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S408v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S408v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S408v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S408v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S408v4.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51362/0/S408-PCS35279-TT-17
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54970/0/S408-PCS45592-TRxfr-16
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/55011/0/S408-PCS45595-TR-17
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S408-SMCE-68(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S408-SMTR-72(CSTRxfr-15)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S408-SMTR-74(CSTRxfr-16)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S408-SMTR-75(e4)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/173
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/693

Bill Comments

feedback