NC S387 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Ch. Res 2016-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Ch. Res 2016-21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
SBE Confirmations
Title
SBE Confirmations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Ch. Res 2016-21 | |
2016-06-29 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2016 |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 32 |
2016-06-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed |