NC S386 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-02 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-02 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Summary
Counties to Report Anticipated Use of PSBCF.
Title
Counties to Report Anticipated Use of PSBCF.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-12 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-28 | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-04-28 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-03-04 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S386 |