NC S357 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-21 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Helping Consumers in Crisis Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Helping Consumers in Crisis Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-21SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-09-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-09-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-09-20SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-09-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-25SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback