NC S349 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amd Various Laws/Study Golf Course Tax Policy
Title
Amd Various Laws/Study Golf Course Tax Policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-23 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary II Stricken |
2015-04-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary II |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H350 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Ch. SL 2015-165