NC S344 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vintage Auto Inspections
Title
Vintage Auto Inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | Ch. SL 2013-349 | |
2013-07-23 | Signed by Gov. 7/23/2013 | |
2013-07-16 | Pres. To Gov. 07/16/2013 | |
2013-07-15 | Ratified | |
2013-07-11 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-10 | House | Postponed To 07/11/2013 |
2013-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2013 |
2013-07-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-07-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-23 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-04-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-04-18 | Engrossed | |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/18/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/16/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Filed |