NC S328 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm Lt. Gen. Walter Gaskin/Sec. DMVA
Title
Confirm Lt. Gen. Walter Gaskin/Sec. DMVA
Sponsors
Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Kirk deViere [D] | Sen. Michael Lazzara [R] |
Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Select Committee on Nominations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Adopted
Appointments
Armed Forces
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Military Affairs Dept.
Public Officials
Resolutions
Simple
Veterans
Appointments
Armed Forces
Confirmation
General Assembly
Governor
Military Affairs Dept.
Public Officials
Resolutions
Simple
Veterans