NC S313 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-31 - Ch. SL 2015-299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial Hemp

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Hemp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-31 Ch. SL 2015-299
2015-10-31 Became Law W/o Signature
2015-09-30 Pres. To Gov. 09/30/2015
2015-09-29 Ratified
2015-09-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2015-09-29SenateConcurred In H/Com Sub
2015-09-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/29/2015
2015-09-28SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2015-09-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2015-09-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-09-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-09-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2015-09-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-09-28HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2015-08-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-08-03HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2015-07-30HousePlaced On Cal For 08/03/2015
2015-07-30HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-07-30HouseReptd Fav
2015-07-28HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-07-28HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-07-22HouseRe-ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Finance
2015-07-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2015-06-30HouseRe-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-06-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2015-04-21HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2015-04-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-04-20HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2015-04-20SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2015-04-16SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2015-04-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2015-04-15SenateReptd Fav
2015-03-24SenateRe-ref Com On Transportation
2015-03-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-03-17SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=S313&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S313v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S313v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S313v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S313v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S313v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/Senate/HTML/S313v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=110
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1054
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=743

Bill Comments

feedback