NC S297 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Ch. SL 2011-168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Ch. SL 2011-168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Durham/Small Business Enterprise
Title
Durham/Small Business Enterprise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Ch. SL 2011-168 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-15 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-06-13 | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-06-13 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-09 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-05-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-10 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H434 (Same As) 2011-04-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House