NC S296 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Current Operations Appropriations Act Changes
Title
Current Operations Appropriations Act Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] | Sen. Michael Lazzara [R] | Sen. Michael Garrett [D] |
Sen. Julie Mayfield [D] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-11-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-11-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-11-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-08 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-05 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Cama
Capital & Infrastructure Fund
Capital Spending
Coastal Resources
Commissions
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Environment
Firefighters & Firefighting
Fish & Wildlife
Fisheries
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
Macclesfield
Municipalities
Policy Collaboratory
Public
Reports
Session Laws
Studies
Title Change
Unc
Volunteers
Wildlife Resources Comn.
Budgeting
Cama
Capital & Infrastructure Fund
Capital Spending
Coastal Resources
Commissions
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Services
Environment
Firefighters & Firefighting
Fish & Wildlife
Fisheries
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
Macclesfield
Municipalities
Policy Collaboratory
Public
Reports
Session Laws
Studies
Title Change
Unc
Volunteers
Wildlife Resources Comn.