NC S293 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-518
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-26 - Ch. SL 2009-518
Summary
Juror Qualifications/Electronic Juror List.
Title
Juror Qualifications/Electronic Juror List.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-26 | Ch. SL 2009-518 | |
2009-08-26 | Signed By Gov. 8/26/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-28 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-07-28 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-27 | Postponed To 7/28/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Postponed To 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-16 | Postponed To 7/21/2009 | |
2009-07-15 | Placed On Cal For 7/16/2009 | |
2009-07-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-09 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-07-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/7/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-04-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-02-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S293 |