NC S265 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Ch. SL 2022-53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Ch. SL 2022-53
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Bond Info Transparency/LGC Toolkit II
Title
Bond Info Transparency/LGC Toolkit II
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Ch. SL 2022-53 | |
2022-07-07 | Signed by Gov. 7/7/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2022 | |
2022-07-01 | Ratified | |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2022 |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2022-06-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-03-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-13 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Accounting
Auditing & Audits
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Commissions
Council Of State
Debt/local Government
Education
Elections
Elementary Education
Investments
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Notification
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Secondary Education
State Treasurer
Title Change
Auditing & Audits
Chaptered
Charter Schools
Commissions
Council Of State
Debt/local Government
Education
Elections
Elementary Education
Investments
Local Government
Local Government Comn.
Notification
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Secondary Education
State Treasurer
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 218.100 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 218.15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 48.55 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 69.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 69.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
159 | 148 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 29 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 30.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 33.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 52 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 55 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 55.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 56 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 7 | (n/a) | Citation Text |