NC S255 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Ch. SL 2021-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

2021 AOC Legislative Changes.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2021 AOC Legislative Changes.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Ch. SL 2021-47
2021-06-18 Signed by Gov. 6/18/2021
2021-06-10 Pres. To Gov. 6/10/2021
2021-06-09 Ratified
2021-06-08SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-08SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2021-06-07SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/08/2021
2021-06-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-06-03SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-03SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-06-03HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-06-02HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-06-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-02HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-06-02HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-06-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-06-02HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-06-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-27HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-27HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-31HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-31HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-03-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-03-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-25SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-03-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-17SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-11SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1239(n/a)Citation Text
1310(n/a)Citation Text
1339.70(n/a)Citation Text
122C(n/a)Citation Text
122C268(n/a)Citation Text
14209(n/a)Citation Text
15A(n/a)Citation Text
15A101.1(n/a)Citation Text
15A1011(n/a)Citation Text
15A150(n/a)Citation Text
15A245(n/a)Citation Text
15A304(n/a)Citation Text
15A305(n/a)Citation Text
15A511(n/a)Citation Text
15A532(n/a)Citation Text
15A601(n/a)Citation Text
15A941(n/a)Citation Text
15A951(n/a)Citation Text
16218(n/a)Citation Text
1A(n/a)Citation Text
1A1(n/a)Citation Text
1C(n/a)Citation Text
1C1603(n/a)Citation Text
42(n/a)Citation Text
4234.1(n/a)Citation Text
50B(n/a)Citation Text
50B2(n/a)Citation Text
50C(n/a)Citation Text
50C6(n/a)Citation Text
50C7(n/a)Citation Text
7A(n/a)Citation Text
7A171.3(n/a)Citation Text
7A180(n/a)Citation Text
7A375(n/a)Citation Text
7A38.1(n/a)Citation Text
7A38.2(n/a)Citation Text
7A38.3B(n/a)Citation Text
7A47.3(n/a)Citation Text
7A49.6(n/a)Citation Text
7A52(n/a)Citation Text
7A98(n/a)Citation Text
7B(n/a)Citation Text
7B1906(n/a)Citation Text
92(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S255
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S255v7.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1732/0/S255-PCS15159-TG-9
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51965/0/S255-PCS55045-RNf-19
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51978/0/S255-PCS15301-RN-20
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51983/0/S255-A-NBC-8984
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S255-SMTG-14(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S255-SMTG-15(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S255-SMRN-64(CSRN-19)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S255-SMRN-65(e5)-v-3
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/62
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/372
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/256

Bill Comments 750

feedback