NC S248 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Ch. SL 2023-37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Ch. SL 2023-37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Nash Bd. of Educ/No. of Members/Districts
Title
Nash Bd. of Educ/No. of Members/Districts
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Barnes [R] | Sen. Buck Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Ch. SL 2023-37 | |
2023-06-12 | Ratified | |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2023 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-06-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-25 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-25 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/25/2023 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 37 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 37.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 41 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 518 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 292 | (n/a) | Citation Text |