NC S244 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Ch. SL 2011-92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Ch. SL 2011-92
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire and Rescue/Survivor's Benefit
Title
Fire and Rescue/Survivor's Benefit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Ch. SL 2011-92 | |
2011-05-26 | Signed By Gov. 5/26/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Pres. To Gov. 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Ratified | |
2011-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-05 | Re-ref Com On State Personnel | |
2011-05-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-14 | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2011-03-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-08 | Ref To Com On Insurance | |
2011-03-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |