NC S241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Transportation Confirmation
Title
Secretary of Transportation Confirmation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Filed |