NC S227 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School Bus Crash Reports Name Disclosure
Title
School Bus Crash Reports Name Disclosure
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A1 Folwell\Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - A1 Folwell\Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-147 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-07-02 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-07-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-07-02 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-07-27 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-07-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-14 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-22 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-07 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-03-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H401 (Same As) 2011-07-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House