NC S218 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Ch. SL 2015-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Ch. SL 2015-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Franklin/Archdale/Satellite Annexation
Title
Franklin/Archdale/Satellite Annexation
Sponsors
Sen. James Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Ch. SL 2015-81 | |
2015-06-17 | Ratified | |
2015-06-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-28 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2015-05-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/26/2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Filed |