NC S195 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-14 - Ch. SL 2023-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-14 - Ch. SL 2023-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
UNC Omnibus
Title
UNC Omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - Senate - Conference Report Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-14 | Ch. SL 2023-102 | |
2023-07-14 | Senate | Became Law W/o Signature |
2023-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2023 | |
2023-07-03 | Ratified | |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-06-28 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2023-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-06-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2023-06-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2023 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2023-06-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-07 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-23 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H317 (Same As) 2023-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Counties
Education
Employment
Funds & Accounts
Government Employees
Greensboro
Guilford County
Higher Education
Municipalities
Personnel
Presented
Public
Ratified
School Of Science & Math
Secondary Education
State Employees
Stem
Unc
Colleges & Universities
Counties
Education
Employment
Funds & Accounts
Government Employees
Greensboro
Guilford County
Higher Education
Municipalities
Personnel
Presented
Public
Ratified
School Of Science & Math
Secondary Education
State Employees
Stem
Unc
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
116 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116 | 209.61 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 209.90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 300 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 41.13 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 41.13A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
126 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
126 | 1.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
126 | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 439 | (n/a) | Citation Text |