NC S173 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Status: Introduced on February 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-18 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Summary
Wilmington ETJ Authority Restored.
Title
Wilmington ETJ Authority Restored.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-18 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-06-18 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-08 | Postponed To 6/18/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-09 | Ref To Com On Local Government II | |
2009-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-17 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H965 (Same As) 2009-04-02 - Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S173 |