NC S172 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Jacksonville Occ. Tax/Wrightsville Deannex
Title
Jacksonville Occ. Tax/Wrightsville Deannex
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-07-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-07-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-03-27 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-03-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-26 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |