NC S168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

DHHS & Other Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHHS & Other Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - A1 Dobson Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-07-06 Vetoed 07/06/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-26SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-26SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-25HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-25SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2020-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2020-06-24HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2020-06-24HouseOrdered Engrossed
2020-06-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-24HouseAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-24HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2020-06-24HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2020-06-24HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-15HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-11HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-11SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-10SenateEngrossed
2019-04-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-10SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-09SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-04-03SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-03-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-13SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-07SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-27SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S168
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S168v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/86
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/85
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1026
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1027
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1063
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/856
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/877

Bill Comments

feedback