NC S167 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-560
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-560
Summary
No Smoking/Cell Phones on Prison Grounds.
Title
No Smoking/Cell Phones on Prison Grounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-560 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2009-08-04 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-27 | Postponed To 8/4/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-28 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-05-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-16 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-02-12 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S167 |